Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tellez, Daisy, filed a(n) Other Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) case against Jaramillo, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2009 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Tellez, D. vs. Jaramillo, J. Motion OSC Details: 211255 - Harassment ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Additional Info : Reissue Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Sep 3 2009 Type: 243410 - Dismissal: Other Court Ordered Manner : 251110 - After Court Trial |
|
August 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Tellez, D. vs. Jaramillo, J. Motion OSC Details: 221120 - Civil Harassment ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order: Temporary Restraining Order 214230-Order: Temporary Rest. Order Motion/OSC Detail: 211255 - Harassment Add'l Description: Reissue Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: TEMPORARY REST. ORDER [214230] Motion: HARASSMENT [211255] Additional Description : REISSUE Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
|
June 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request 229110-Request Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST [229110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.