Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2018 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
POST JUDGMENT ORDER - DEFAULT ORDER IN SUIT FOR MODIFICATION OF SUPPORT ORDER AND TO CONFIRM SUPPORT ARREARAGE / SIGNED 08-05-19 |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Hrg called: OAG Blackburn, Mr. Johnson served, FTA, Ms. Williams pro se sworn and testified, Orders rendered and signed, JFowler Associate Judge |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FILED ELECTRONICALLY | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION KEVIN JOHNSON SERVED 6/28/19 |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION SAMARA LASHEA WILLIAMS SERVED 06/19/19 BY POTTER |
|
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.