Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Emerson, Don presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmerson, Don Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG ANNOUNCE NONSUIT |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE 05/29/2018 AT 9:30AM |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION SERVED 1/30/18 $75.00 |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ISSUE AG - CITATION ALLISON HATFIELD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.