Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Emerson, Don presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmerson, Don Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF NONSUIT |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PATERNITY TEST | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Paternity Testing Order 5/29/18 8:30 |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CITATION | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF CITATION | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE 02/26/18 @ 8:30 AM |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | FAMILY COVER SHEET | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER SETTING HEARING SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) PETITION TO ESTABLISH THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.