Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER PLAINTIFF DISMISSAL Notice of Nonsuit |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY OAG ann'd nonsuit |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION UNSERVED $75.00 |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE 7/23/18 @8:30 AM |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Ms. Gilbreath appeared, reset for service 7/23/18 8:30 |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED CITATION ROBERT HOOD UNSERVED BY POTTER $75 |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ISSUE AG - CITATION | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.