Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Billy, Valerie Lynnette, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodburn, Doug Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER IN SUIT AFFECTING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY DEFAULT ORDER - MS. BILLY AND MS. KEARNS APPEARED - SUPPORT AMOUNT ESTABLISHED - SIGNED BY JUDGE WILCOX BY ASSIGNMENT |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE JULY 16, 2018 @8:30 AM |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | DOCKET ENTRY | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING/ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE 04/16/18 @ 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.