Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Rodriguez, Augustine, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court with Emerson, Don presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmerson, Don Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryAg-Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURNED NOTICE | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED NOTICE RE: ORDER ESTABLISHING PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER ESTABLISHING THE PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP SIGNED 07/17/18 |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RESPONDENT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY AGREED ORDER - PATERNITY ESTABLISHED - SIGNED BY JUDGE WILCOX BY ASSIGNMENT |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | PATERNITY EVALUATION REPORT | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Mr Galvan and MS. Carbajal here, reset to 7/17/18 8:30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.