Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Loza, Julie, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Martinez, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 108th District Court with Woodburn, Doug presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryAg-Support Order/Suit Affecting |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House108th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Compliance | |
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY Case continued. Attorney Barfield denies having notice. |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Competency Hearing | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER ON MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL signed. Brooks Barfield subst for Joel Jackson. |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PARTY OF ORDER FILED | |
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
POST JUDGMENT ORDER - FINAL ORDER ENFORCING CHILD SUPPORT ORDER WITH COMMITMENT SUSPENDED / SIGNED 11-01-19 |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER ENFORCING CHILD SUPPORT ORDER WITH COMMITMENT SUSPENDED signed. |
|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SENT TO COURT'S QUEUE /ENFORCING CHILD SUPPORT ORDER |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM signed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.