Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Anderson, Brittany Rachelle, represented by Ray, Lendon E., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts with Pamela C. Sirmon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | WARRANT - UNSERVED | |
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | COPY OF DISPOSITION CARD | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURTS CERTIFICATION OF DEFTS RIGHT TO APPEAL | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO VIDEOCONFERENCE PLEA AND WAIVER | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT PAPERS ISSUED - FORWARDED TO TDCJ | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION - GUILTY PLEA OR NOLO CONTENDRE (OCA) 6 Months State Jail, 8/10/2020 |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUED ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT - CRIMINAL | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | WRITTEN PLEA ADMONISHMENT PACKET | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | RECV.STMT./FACTS TO FORWARD TO S.O |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.