Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cardoza, Marcelino, represented by Walker, Misty L., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 47th District Court with Schaap, Dan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedAugust 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House47th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISCOVERY | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PRODUCE EXCULPATORY AND MITIGATING EVIDENCE | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFT REQ FOR NOTICE OF STATES INT TO USE EVID EXTRANEOUS OFF | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP ARTICLE 39.14 | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING (PRE-TRIAL AND TRIAL SPECIAL SETTING ORDER) |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | STATES' APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUBPOENA(S) - STATE | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | STATES' APPLICATION FOR SUBPOENA | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ISSUED SUBPOENA(S) - STATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.