Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Greathouse, Bambi Michelle, represented by Watkins, Mike, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts with Schaap, Dan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION - MISDEMEANOR (OCA) 1yr PCDC 07/18/2019 |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | WRITTEN PLEA ADMONISHMENT PACKET | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURTS CERTIFICATION OF DEFTS RIGHT TO APPEAL | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Plea | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S WARNING | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN BENCH WARRANT | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTEST TO BENCH WARRANT | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR BENCH WARRANT | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER Bench Warrant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.