Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mink, Audrey Lynn filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Yarbrough, Chris, represented by Clark, James, Hatter, Q. Todd, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 47th District Court with Schaap, Dan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSchaap, Dan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House47th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AMENDING CONDITIONS OF PROBATION | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER DEFERRING ADJUDICATION OF GUILT (OCA) Deft Given 4 Years CSCD & $500 Fine 1/4/19 |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS ISSUED | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | PRECEPT - UNSERVED | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF PRESERVATION OF EVIDENCE | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEAL AFTER SENTENCE HAS BEEN IMPOSED | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURTS CERTIFICATION OF DEFTS RIGHT TO APPEAL | |
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOCKET ENTRY ase was called in the 47th District Court. Parties announced ready. Defendant appeared with Counsel and waived reading of Indictment/Information and the right to trial by jury. After admonishments (including, if applicable, the potential effect of plea on Alien Status under Art. 26.13 C.C.P), Defendant entered a plea of guilty. Finding that Defendant signed the plea paperwork knowingly and willingly, that Defendant was mentally competent, and that Defendant's plea was voluntary, the Court accepted Defendant's judicial confession and plea. The Court accepted the proposed plea agreement as follows: The evidence found sufficient to substantiate Defendant's plea of guilty, but further proceedings deferred without an adjudication of guilt and Defendant was placed on probation for 4 years and $500. Proceedings reported by Dina Wall. |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event | WRITTEN PLEA ADMONISHMENT PACKET | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL James Clark for Todd Q. Hatter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.