Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Murphy, Ethan filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Martinez, Michael Anthony, represented by Coats, Eric S., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEstevez, Ana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COUNSEL FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS TX | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
MANDATE AFFIRMING JUDGMENT OF TRIAL COURT - 7TH CRT APPEALS July 27, 2020 |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ISSUED - NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF MANDATE | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED ORDER REGARDING ORDER TO WITHDRAW INMATE ACCOUNT | |
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER TO WITHDRAW FROM INMATE ACCOUNTS | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | CHECK IN EXHIBITS | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO COUNSEL FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS TX State's Exhibit Nos. 93 &94 Filed in Caption Appeal |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS Court reporter checked out exhibit 93 & 94 |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER TO CLERK AND COURT REPORTER FROM 7TH COURT OF APPEALS | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT ORDER - ATTORNEY -Eric Coats |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.