Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jaramillo, Miguel Angel, represented by Martindale, Matthew C., in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 251st District Court with Estevez, Ana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House251st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISCHARGING DEFT FROM DEFERRED ADJUDICATION | |
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AMENDING CONDITIONS OF PROBATION | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AMENDING CONDITIONS OF PROBATION | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER AMENDING CONDITIONS OF PROBATION | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | SAFPF PROGRESS AND CONDUCT REPORT | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | FILE SUBST. ABUSE FEL. PUNSH FAC.REPRT | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CLIENT'S ARRIVAL AT SAFPF | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING / AMENDING COMMUNITY SUPERVISION ( OCA) | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CONTINUATION OF MODIFICATION OF SPECIAL CONDITION | |
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURTS CERTIFICATION OF DEFTS RIGHT TO APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.