Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmillian, Thomas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rivers, Kaseme, in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2014 |
CategoryAdult Felony - Filed By Indictment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
FILE & ENTER ORDER FILE & ENTER PAYMENT ORDER: RYAN TURMAN Init: DSB |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE PRECEPT - UNSERVED Init: TRH | |
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event | FILE MOTION AND ENTER ORDER TO DISMISS Init: TRH | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT W/ORDER Init: KMW | |
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE & ENTER TRANSFER ORDER: ^ FILE & ENTER TRANSFER ORDER: FROM 108TH TO 320TH Init: ET |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event | ISSUE PRECEPT W/ CERTIFIED COPY Init: VLJ | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE INDICTMENT Init: VLJ | |
August 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 39.14 Init: KMW | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event | FILE MAGISTRATE'S WARNING Init: KAD | |
August 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
FINCL STMT W/ORDER APPTNG ATTY^ FINCL STMT W/ORDER APPTNG ATTY RYAN TURMAN Init: TRH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.