Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Potter County, TX, . Potter County, TX Superior Courts 320th District Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2000 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPotter County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court House320th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | TERMINATION NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS DESTROYED | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS SENT FOR DESTRUCTION | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
COMPLIANCE HEARING see order |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | FINDING REGARDING COMPLIANCE HEARING | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | FINDING REGARDING COMPLIANCE HEARING | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
COMPLIANCE HEARING next compliance hearing 10/18/17 8:30 am |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.