Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Avalin Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Walker, Lorna Ann, against Galer, Cheri J. Carstensen, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 24, 2009 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Avalin LLC vs. Galer, C. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 212510-Correspondence Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CORRESPONDENCE [212510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Avalin LLC vs. Galer, C. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Avalin LLC vs. Galer, C. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 212310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE [212310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.