Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Towson, Craig presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2023 |
CategoryCivil – Related To Criminal Matters |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Filing | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Filing | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Filing | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.