Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burke, Robert, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case against Hall, John, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Hayes, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2002 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeTrial By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Abstract
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
June 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Civil Judgment
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
June 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Global Case Event
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
Citation HALL, JOHN Served 03/12/2003
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
Service
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Other
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 20, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (JP OCA)
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.