Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Azle Independent School District, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Mark D. Stoecker, against Sparks, Lydia M., Sparks, Carl D., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Hayes, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2002 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeTrial By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2004 | Docket Event |
Form Printed
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Unserved
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
October 31, 2003 | Docket Event |
Writ
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
May 27, 2003 | Docket Event |
Civil Judgment
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
May 27, 2003 | Docket Event |
Global Case Event
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Other
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 16, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (JP OCA)
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.