Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Azle Independent School Distrcit, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Mark D. Stoecker, against Kappel, Ronnie P, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Hayes, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2002 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeTrial By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Release Of Judgment Lien
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ KAPPEL, RONNIE P Unserved
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Form Viewed
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
August 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Service
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Form Viewed
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
February 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment For Plaintiff
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
February 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Civil Judgment
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
February 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Global Case Event
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Service
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
|
December 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Citation KAPPEL, RONNIE P Served 12/29/2003
Judge: Hayes, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.