Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Don Schnebly, against U.S. Specialty Ins. Co Dba Bail Bond, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2017 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi On Forfeiture Of Bond |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL HEARING Case Disposed CANCELED FINAL HEARING (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Case Disposed |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Judgment No Jury (OCA) | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Notice | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Nisi on Forfeiture of Bond | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Garcia-Guerrero, Hugo Alfredo Unserved | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation Texas Bonding Co dba Bail Bond Served 02/27/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.