Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Smith, Robert Lee, Davis, Carla J., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2017 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Case Disposed CANCELED Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Case Disposed |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Final Order Mailed | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Agreed Order | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Request | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.