Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Attorney General Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Lloyd, Jennifer Rachelle, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2017 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Final Order Mailed | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation GLASGOW, MICHAEL GLENN Served 03/03/2017 Lloyd, Jennifer Rachelle Served 03/07/2017 | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.