Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pool, Matthew Eric, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wolf, Amanda Kate, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) 11/03/2021 Reset by Court to 11/15/2021 11/15/2021 Reset by Court to 12/01/2021 Result: Order Signed | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (OCA) | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.