Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Holmes, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
December 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Tax Citation HOLMES, PETER Returned Unserved 01/15/2015 Returned 01/15/2015 | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
October 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.