Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Duggin, Jennifer, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brian W Butcher, against Fuller, Dustin, Fuller, Makayela, Fuller, Paula Kaye, Turner, Timothy Ray, represented by Michael A. Yanof, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2014 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter | |
October 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Mandate | |
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Opinion | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.