Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Valenzuela, Mariza, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David S. Kohm, against Lindsey, Kayla, represented by Sapna Perera, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Craig Towson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2012 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Case Disposed CANCELED Dismissal Docket (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Case Disposed |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
JY Agreed Resolution CANCELED JY (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Agreed Resolution 10/27/2014 Reset by Court to 10/27/2014 |
|
October 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
JY Per Judge CANCELED JY (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Per Judge 09/22/2014 Reset by Court to 09/22/2014 |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.