Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Whitworth, Richard Franklin, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2012 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Answer | |
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
May 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.