Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Pacheco, Juan Felipe, Jr., Daniels, Teresa Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2012 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Case Disposed CANCELED Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Case Disposed |
|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Final Order Mailed | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket Other CANCELED Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Other |
|
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
April 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.