Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Rios, Michael Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2012 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Information | |
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Other | |
November 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 928447 Vol./Book 928447 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.