Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Galindo, Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James R. Baudhuin, against Phelps, Cody, represented by Stephen R. Parris, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2012 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Other | |
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 891694 Vol./Book 891694 |
|
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Jury Requested | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.