Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Deere & Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sharon H. Sjostrom, against Standley, Earnest L., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2012 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ STANDLEY, EARNEST L. Returned Unserved 08/27/2013 Returned 08/27/2013 | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Wop | |
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | AOJ | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment STANDLEY, EARNEST L. Unserved | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 951123 Vol./Book 951123 |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.