Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
T-K-O Equipment Co, filed a(n) case represented by Randall K. Lindley, against Ama Ranch Services D B A Warrior Falls Land Deveopment Llc, represented by Grant S. Goens, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment AMA RANCH SERVICES D B A WARRIOR FALLS LAND DEVEOPMENT LLC Unserved | |
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 03, 2012 | Docket Event | AOJ | |
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Motion Granted | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 873238 Vol./Book 873238 |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.