Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, Millsap Independent School District, filed a(n) case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Property Tax Fix Llc, Lindbloom, Stephanie, Lindbloom, Michael E., Jr., Lindbloom, Michael E, Sr., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2012 |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Other | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf | |
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation LINDBLOOM, MICHAEL E Served 02/27/2013 Returned 02/27/2013 | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Citation | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Tax Citation LINDBLOOM, MICHAEL E. Unserved | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Tax Citation | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Tax Citation LINDBLOOM, STEPHANIE Served 02/22/2013 Returned 02/22/2013 | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf | |
February 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.