Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Et Al, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Daniel, Bruce, Bernal, Mario, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Towson, Craig presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2012 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Towson, Craig) Result: Held
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
$Disp
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation DANIEL, BRUCE Served 06/15/2012 Returned 06/15/2012
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 859811 Vol./Book 859811 Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Loftin, Trey Converted Disposition:Party: DANIEL, BRUCE Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Glenna Windell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.