Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Witt, Susan, Witt, Robert, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Mark M Childress, against Witt, Macy Sierra, Whatley, Clint, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2012 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
March 15, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Loftin, Trey) Result: Removed by Court | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | WRIT (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 828865 Vol./Book 828865 |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ WITT, MACY SIERRA Served 03/22/2012 Returned 03/22/2012 | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | File | |
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.