Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Century 21 Judge Fite Co., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by John Westhoff, against Kinman, Robert D., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Release Of Judgment | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | AOJ | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ KINMAN, ROBERT D. Returned Unserved 06/21/2011 Returned 06/21/2011 | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Woe | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment KINMAN, ROBERT D. Unserved | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 688356 Vol./Book 688356 |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.