Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Berrier, Dearl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Berrier, Ryan Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book 715534 Vol./Book 715534 |
|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
January 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Information | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter | |
December 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.