Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher D Osborn, against Henderson, Patricia A, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 851261 Vol./Book 851261 |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Loftin, Trey) Result: Held | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 784766 Vol./Book 784766 |
|
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
June 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.