Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hill, Roger, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by John R Fabry, against Union Pacific Railroad Company, represented by John W. Proctor, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Written Discovery | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 708478 Vol./Book 708478 |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Written Discovery | |
March 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Objection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.