Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kay, Rachel D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kay, James Preston, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book 777347 Vol./Book 777347 |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | PROVE UP (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Held | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Party | |
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.