Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hasty, Donna, Bacon, Gary, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case against Macon, Carolyn Sue, Hasty, Jack M, represented by Richard L. Hattox, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Mandate Vol./Book 797923 Vol./Book 797923 |
|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 776019 Vol./Book 776019 |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 750654 Vol./Book 750654 |
|
July 25, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.