Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Real, Robert, filed a(n) Transfer In - Venue case represented by Derrick J Hahn, against Whitford, Robert L., Shupick, Michael, represented by Daniel A Corbin, Brooke Ulrickson Allen, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2010 |
CategoryTransfer In - Venue |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Release Of Judgment | |
August 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Woe | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ SHUPICK, MICHAEL Unserved | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Objection | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.