Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Schumann, Gus Walter, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Schumann, Arminda Lou, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Information | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book 712222 Vol./Book 712222 |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Counter Petition (Fee) | |
December 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.