Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fia Card Services, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Christopher D Osborn, against Lapp, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
November 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Loftin, Trey) Result: Dismissed | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Information | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation LAPP, ROBERT Unserved | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.