Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hodges, Robin Lanese, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hodges, Terry Swanson, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Decree Vol./Book 660420 Vol./Book 660420 |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 12, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.