Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Rey, Monica Cheyenne, Massey, Joseph Montgomery, Jr., Lozano, Tammy Lyzette, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategorySuit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Information | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Other Document | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 633942 Vol./Book 633942 |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Additional Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.