Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Roberts, Carla, Roberts, Darryl, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David D. Disiere, against Dennington, Gary, Restoration, Servicemaster Elite, Servicemaster Residential Commercial Services.L.P. D B A Servicemaster Clean, Me, represented by David L. Sargent, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2009 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 722775 Vol./Book 722775 |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation DENNINGTON, GARY Served 01/19/2010 Returned 01/19/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.