Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Woodall, Todd A, Woodall, Amber, Singletary, Monty Ray, Singletary, Lillie Mae, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2009 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Vol./Book 702842 Vol./Book 702842 |
|
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Tax Citation SINGLETARY, LILLIE MAE Served 02/07/2011 Returned 02/07/2011 | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Tax Citation | |
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Tax Citation SINGLETARY, MONTY RAY Served 12/02/2010 Returned 12/02/2010 | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Tax Citation | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Tax Citation WOODALL, AMBER Served 11/30/2010 Returned 11/30/2010 | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.